Withers et al v. Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club Inc et al
Plaintiff: Julie Withers and Dawn Green
Defendant: NBBJ LLC, HKS, Inc. d/b/a HKS Architects Inc., Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District, Miller Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., Eppstein Uhen Architects, Inc., Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc and HKS Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00115
Filed: January 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss and for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Kempowski, Jacob)
March 19, 2019 Filing 29 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond . (Wronski, Andrew)
March 14, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond filed by Julie Withers, Dawn Green ; All documents must contain an electronic signature. The Affidavit to this document should have been filed as a separate entry. Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty. Paul A. Strouse)(Strouse, Paul) Modified on 3/15/2019 (jcl).
February 28, 2019 Filing 27 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by HKS Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Siesennop, W)
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 DISCLOSURE Statement by HKS Inc. (Siesennop, W)
February 28, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by HKS Inc.(Siesennop, W)
February 28, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by W Wayne Siesennop on behalf of HKS Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: W. Wayne Siesennop / Joffrey K. Van Nostrand (Siesennop, W)
February 28, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Joinder Motion to Adopt or Join Co-Defendant Eppstein Uhen Architects, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and Brief Supporting its Motion to Dismiss by NBBJ LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Modl, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Modl on behalf of NBBJ LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael J. Modl (Modl, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan N Parsons on behalf of Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club, Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District. Attorney(s) appearing: Ryan N. Parsons (Parsons, Ryan)
February 22, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
February 22, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (LaFlamme, Eugene)
February 22, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc. (LaFlamme, Eugene)
February 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob E Kempowski on behalf of Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jacob E. Kempowski (Kempowski, Jacob)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Miller Brewers Baseball Club Inc, Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Wronski, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District.(Wronski, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Miller Brewers Baseball Club Inc. (Wronski, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Miller Brewers Baseball Club Inc.(Wronski, Andrew)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc re #7 MOTION to Dismiss . (LaFlamme, Eugene)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc. (LaFlamme, Eugene)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc of Motion to Dismiss (LaFlamme, Eugene)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene M LaFlamme on behalf of Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Eugene M. LaFlamme (LaFlamme, Eugene)
January 31, 2019 Summons Issued as to HKS Inc. (bx)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Strouse, Paul)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dawn Green, Julie Withers. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Strouse, Paul)
January 24, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Julie Withers, Dawn Green ; All documents must contain an electronic signature. You must RE-FILE this document.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Dawn Green, Julie Withers. (Strouse, Paul)
January 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants.(sent via USPS) (jcl)
January 22, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
January 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eppstein Uhen Architects, Inc., HKS, Inc. d/b/a HKS Architects Inc., Miller Brewers Baseball Club, Inc., NBBJ LLC, Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District by Julie Withers, Dawn Green. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3014599) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Strouse, Paul) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #8 Complaint (Signed & Dated)) (blr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Withers et al v. Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBBJ LLC
Represented By: Michael J Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKS, Inc. d/b/a HKS Architects Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Wisconsin Professional Baseball Park District
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Ryan N Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miller Brewers Baseball Club, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eppstein Uhen Architects, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee Brewers Baseball Club
Represented By: Andrew J Wronski
Represented By: Ryan N Parsons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eppstein Uhen Architects Inc
Represented By: Jacob E Kempowski
Represented By: Eugene M LaFlamme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HKS Inc
Represented By: W Wayne Siesennop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Withers
Represented By: Paul A Strouse
Represented By: Thomas R Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Green
Represented By: Paul A Strouse
Represented By: Thomas R Napierala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?