Moeller et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Robert Moeller
Defendant: United States of America
Undetermined: United Healthcare Insurance Company and American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00166
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #20 Disclosure Statement filed by Robert Moeller ; Certain discovery documents should not be filed. Please see Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d) for further information. The document has been replaced with a copy of Rule 5. Discovery documents should be served on opposing counsel in paper format; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 DISCOVERY replaced with Rule 5(d)DISCLOSURE Statement by Robert Moeller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rymer, Timothy) (Main Document 20 replaced on 3/25/2019) (blr). Modified on 3/25/2019 (blr).
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 3/22/2019: Interim Settlement Report due by 9/4/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 12/16/2019; Motions in Limine and all other Non-Dispositive Motions due by 12/18/19; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 12/23/19; Trial Briefs due by 12/23/19; Briefs in Opposition due by 12/27/19. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/19 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Court Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 3/22/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by William R Salmonowicz on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: William Salmonowicz (Salmonowicz, William)
March 19, 2019 Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Robert Moeller. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Rymer, Timothy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mundt, Rick)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/19/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 7, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to INVOLUNTARY PLAINTIFF; United Healthcare Insurance Company requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Stewart, Carter)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Carter Bryan Stewart on behalf of United States of America. Attorney(s) appearing: Carter B. Stewart (Stewart, Carter)
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Robert Moeller. (Rymer, Timothy)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiff filed by United Healthcare Insurance Company. (Mayer, Matthew)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Mayer on behalf of United Healthcare Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew S. Mayer (Mayer, Matthew)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Robert Moeller served upon United States Department of Justice on February 13, 2019, ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to United States of America, ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint and Disclosure Statement on February 13, 2019 by United States Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit)(Rymer, Timothy)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 INCOMPLETE; TO BE REFILED Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mundt, Rick) Modified on 3/7/2019 (asc).
February 20, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to INVOLUNTARY PLAINTIFF; American Family Mutual Insurance Company requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Robert Moeller. (Rymer, Timothy)
February 18, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM against Plaintiff filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company. (Mundt, Rick)
February 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick J Mundt on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Rick J. Mundt (Mundt, Rick)
February 4, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (asc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Robert Moeller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rymer, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Robert Moeller. (Rymer, Timothy)
February 1, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against United States of America by Robert Moeller. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3022865) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rymer, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moeller et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Carter Bryan Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Rick J Mundt
Represented By: William R Salmonowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Moeller
Represented By: Timothy J Rymer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?