Christopherson v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Plaintiff: Cody Christopherson
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00202
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 Cross MOTION to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations . (Cook, Gregory)
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF BRIEF in Opposition filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Surreply, BRIEF in Opposition #18 Cross MOTION to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations Defendant's Combined Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. (Chacon, Zacarias) Modified on 3/29/2019 (asc).
March 28, 2019 Filing 21 DISREGARD; TO BE REFILED BRIEF in Opposition filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation re #18 Cross MOTION to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations Defendant's Combined Brief In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion To Strike References to Settlement Negotiations and Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion For Leave to File Surreply. (Chacon, Zacarias) Modified on 3/28/2019 (asc).
March 27, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #17 - #20 . Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
March 26, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Gregory Cook in Support of Cross-Motion to Strike Settlement Negotiations (Cook, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #18 Cross MOTION to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations . (Cook, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 18 Cross MOTION to Strike References to Settlement Negotiations by All Plaintiffs. (Cook, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Surreply . (Cook, Gregory)
March 26, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #16 Declaration ; This document should have been filed as an attachment. The exhibits should have been filed as attachments to the main document. These documents do not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
March 26, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Zacarias Chacon In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Chacon, Zacarias)
March 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Defendant's Motion For Leave To File Surreply by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Chacon, Zacarias)
March 25, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by All Plaintiffs re #7 MOTION to Remand . (Cook, Gregory)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corporation's Answer to Complaint by American Strategic Insurance Corporation.(Chacon, Zacarias)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation re #7 MOTION to Remand Defendant's Memorandum In Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. (Chacon, Zacarias)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/12/2019: Interim Settlement Report due by 9/4/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/10/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 12/16/2019; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 12/18/2019; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 12/23/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/30/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 1/6/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 2/28/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Chacon, Zacarias)
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan Joint Rule 26 Report (with G. Cook) by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Chacon, Zacarias)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Attorney Cook w/Exhibits in Support of Motion to Remand)(Cook, Gregory)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Cody Christopherson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cook, Gregory)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 2/13/2019 GRANTING #5 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant American Strategic Insurance Corporation shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 3/18/2019. The Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 AM will REMAIN as scheduled, and the granting of Defendant's Motion will have no effect on the trial schedule to be set by the Court. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendant's Motion For Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Chacon, Zacarias)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 2/25/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/14/2019) (asc).
February 7, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by American Strategic Insurance Corporation. (Chacon, Zacarias)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Zacarias R Chacon on behalf of American Strategic Insurance Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Zacarias R. Chacon (Chacon, Zacarias)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Strategic Insurance Corporation from Circuit Court of Milwaukee County, Case Number: 2019cv000209 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3027744) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chacon, Zacarias) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/7/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christopherson v. American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Christopherson
Represented By: Gregory J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Strategic Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Zacarias R Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?