Evans v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Africa K Evans
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv00212
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/14/2019. Action DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Africa K. Evans)(jm)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/14/2019: GRANTING #4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; DENYING as moot #8 Defendant's Motion to Stay; and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Africa K. Evans) (jm)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling/Status Conference held on 3/8/2019. (Court Reporter Rich Ehrlich) (nb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service)(Constantine, Emily)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION to Stay by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unpublished Decision, #2 Certificate of Service)(Constantine, Emily)
February 19, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States Postal Service. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Constantine, Emily)
February 15, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kimberly A. Herbst in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Constantine, Emily)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support filed by United States Postal Service re #4 MOTION to Dismiss . (Constantine, Emily)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by United States Postal Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Constantine, Emily)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/5/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Africa K. Evans)(jm) (Main Document 3 replaced on 2/14/2019) (asc).
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States Postal Service (Constantine, Emily)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Postal Service from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19SC00145 with attached state court documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Constantine, Emily) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/11/2019: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Africa K Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?