Centaurus Financial Inc v. Ausloos et al
Plaintiff: Centaurus Financial, Inc. and Centaurus Financial Inc
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority, Adam J. Ausloos and Adam J Ausloos
Case Number: 2:2019cv00243
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2019 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. The court discusses the current status of the case, and the two pending motions. The parties have agreed to a thirty day stay as to FIRA arbitration. The court sets briefing dates for defendant's motion to dismiss: Responses due by April 22, 2019; Replies, if any, due by May 1, 2019.(Tape #2:02:30-2:44:09) (asc)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra S Canape on behalf of Centaurus Financial Inc. (kmm)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Hearing on #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. The parties shall call the court's conference line at 877- 336-1839 and use access code 5188910# to join the call. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 UNPUBLISHED Decision Points & Authorities and Unpublished Order filed by Adam J Ausloos (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FINRA Regulatory Notice, #2 Exhibit Park Ave Sec v. Young (Unpublished Order))(Heller, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Ausloos In Support of Def Mot to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to Def Brief and Aff on Mot to Dismiss)(Heller, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 BRIEF in Support filed by Adam J Ausloos re #17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) MOTION to Stay Litigation . (Heller, Michael)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3), MOTION to Stay Litigation by Adam J Ausloos. (Heller, Michael)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Adam J Ausloos. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Heller, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISCLOSURE Statement by Adam J Ausloos. (Heller, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Adam J Ausloos requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Adam Ausloos Opposing Pl Mot for Prelim Injunction. (Heller, Michael)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Adam J Ausloos re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heller, Michael) Modified on 4/2/2019 (asc).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Reicher, Terri)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT; Financial Industry Regulatory Authority requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority re #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Reicher, Terri)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Financial Industry Regulatory Authority. (Reicher, Terri)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER from Ryan T. Brown Regarding 30 Day Extension for FINRA to Respond to Complaint. (Brown, Ryan)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting #9 Letter Request for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/26/2019. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority answer due 4/19/2019. (llc)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centaurus Financial Inc. Adam J Ausloos served on 3/14/2019. (Brown, Ryan)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Centaurus Financial Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FINRA Notification, #2 Exhibit 2 - Correspondence - Denial of Deadline Abeyance, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email Correspondence, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Kendra S. Canape in Support)(Brown, Ryan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centaurus Financial Inc. Financial Industry Regulatory Authority served on 2/27/2019. (Brown, Ryan)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Centaurus Financial Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brown, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Centaurus Financial Inc (Brown, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Centaurus Financial Inc (Brown, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Centaurus Financial Inc. (Brown, Ryan)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (cms)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Centaurus Financial, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3033782) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FINRA Notice, Statment and Clarification, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Michael Leahy, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Brown, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centaurus Financial Inc v. Ausloos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Industry Regulatory Authority
Represented By: Terri L Reicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J. Ausloos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam J Ausloos
Represented By: Michael G Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centaurus Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan T Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centaurus Financial Inc
Represented By: Ryan T Brown
Represented By: Kendra S Canape
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?