McCane v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al

Plaintiff: Stanley W McCane
Defendant: Patricia Martin, Secretary Robert Wilkie, Clement J Zablocki VA Medical Center and Department of Veteran Affairs
Case Number: 2:2019cv00268
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Reconsideration by Stanley W McCane. (asc)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/13/2019. Action is DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Stanley W. McCane)(jm)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 3/13/2019: GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See Order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Stanley W. McCane) (jm)
March 11, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (Mailed NEF to plaintiff) (asc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Stanley W McCane. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Patricia Martin, Robert Wilkie filed by Stanley W McCane. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within 30 days of this order, McCane shall submit an amended complaint wherein he provides additional information in accordance with the instructions set forth above. The court shall then review his complaint in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) so as to resolve his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. If McCane fails to timely submit his amended complaint or his amended complaint fails to cure the deficiencies of his complaint outlined above, this action shall be dismissed with prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via US mail to Plaintiff w/complaint form)(blr)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (asc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Stanley W McCane. (asc)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Stanley W McCane. (asc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCane v. Department of Veteran Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Robert Wilkie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement J Zablocki VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley W McCane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?