Commerce State Bank v. De Graf Concrete Construction Inc
Plaintiff: Commerce State Bank
Defendant: De Graf Concrete Construction, Inc. and De Graf Concrete Construction Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00306
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/17/2019 GRANTING #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Receiver. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
April 12, 2019 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to De Graf Concrete Construction Inc. (asc)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Timothy H. Posnanski in Support of Request for Entry of Default (Posnanski, Timothy)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Defendant MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant, DeGraf Concrete Construction, Inc. by Commerce State Bank. (Posnanski, Timothy) Modified on 4/12/2019 (asc).
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Process Server's AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant, DeGraf Concrete Construction, Inc. (Posnanski, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Seth Dizard of Disinterestedness. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Curriculum Vitae)(Posnanski, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Kevin E. Volm (Posnanski, Timothy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Commerce State Bank. (Posnanski, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Commerce State Bank. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Posnanski, Timothy)
March 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to De Graf Concrete Construction Inc. (blr)
February 27, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Commerce State Bank. (Posnanski, Timothy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against De Graf Concrete Construction, Inc. by Commerce State Bank. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3042695) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Note 5017998-550, #2 Exhibit B: Note 5017998-500, #3 Exhibit C: Note 5017998-502, #4 Exhibit D: Note 5017998-501, #5 Exhibit E: Alderman Group Note, #6 Exhibit F: Guaranty, #7 Exhibit G: Security Agreement, #8 Summons, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Posnanski, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commerce State Bank v. De Graf Concrete Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commerce State Bank
Represented By: Timothy H Posnanski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Graf Concrete Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Graf Concrete Construction Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?