KJ Tax & Accounting LLC et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Advanced Office Solutions, LLC, KJ Tax & Accounting, LLC, KJ Tax & Accounting LLC and Advanced Office Solutions LLC
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00332
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/11/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 9/20/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 9/25/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 1/13/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 1/17/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 1/22/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 2/3/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(km)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 4/5/2019 ADOPTING #9 Parties' Joint Stipulation for Entry of Protective Order and SPECIFYING the terms as modified for confidential information produced or disclosed during this matter. See Order for further details. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J P Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 3/22/2019 (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (km)
March 21, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION (Joint) for Protective Order by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Protective Order)(Zylstra, Sarah)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by All Defendants. (Zylstra, Sarah)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Zylstra, Sarah)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Advanced Office Solutions LLC, KJ Tax & Accounting LLC. (Lonzo, Thomas)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Advanced Office Solutions LLC, KJ Tax & Accounting LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lonzo, Thomas)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Zylstra, Sarah)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Zylstra, Sarah)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 3/19/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
March 5, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Racine, Case Number: 19CV792 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number 0757-3046625) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Summons, Complaint & First Set of Discovery)(Zylstra, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KJ Tax & Accounting LLC et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Office Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Lonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ Tax & Accounting, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Lonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KJ Tax & Accounting LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Lonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advanced Office Solutions LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Lonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Sarah A Zylstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?