Dixon v. Foster
Petitioner: Maurice D Dixon
Respondent: Brian Foster
Case Number: 2:2019cv00337
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Brian Foster (Burgundy, Sarah)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/12/19 that within 60 days of the date of this order respondent either answer the petition, complying with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing 2254 Cases, or file a dispositive motion. (cc: all counsel, petitioner)(jad)
April 9, 2019 FILING FEE Received: $5.00, receipt number MK4689-077299. (jcl)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from the Clerk to Maurice D Dixon regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 3/22/19 that petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. The petitioner is directed to pay the statutory filing fee of $5 to the Clerk of Court for this district within 21 DAYS of the date of this order. (cc: all counsel, petitioner, financial)(jad)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Maurice D Dixon. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(cms)
March 14, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. Notice sent to petitioner via US Mail. (amb)
March 13, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Maurice D Dixon. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (cms)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to petitioner re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form along with the certified trust account statement all be filed within 21 days. Mailed to petitioner. (cms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Maurice D Dixon. (cms)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Maurice D Dixon. (Attachments: #1 cover letter)(cms) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/6/2019: #2 Exhibits, #3 Exhibits) (cms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon v. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian Foster
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - Habeas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maurice D Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?