Dawson v. Res-Care Inc et al

Plaintiff: Tequilla Marie Dawson
Defendant: Res-Care Inc, Sandra Corey, Gabriella Borda-Rossel, Steven Reinhold, Stacey Ellis, Amanda Kleet, Kim Savage, Mary Dixon, Gary Rudzianis and Katie Dziedzic
Case Number: 2:2019cv00378
Filed: March 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Office: Milwaukee Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days (jcl)
March 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
March 14, 2019 Filing 37 Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:17-cv-00785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Transfer to Eastern District of Wisconsin; denying #35 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 3/13/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 35 Motion Requesting Appointment of Counsel by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson. (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 34 Brief in Sur-Reply by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson re: #9 Motion to Transfer filed by Res-Care Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D.P. Riggins & Associates, Inc. v. American Board Companies, Inc., et al., #2 Exhibit B - Jonathan and Theresa Tross v. Ritz Carlton Hotel Company, LLC., et al., #3 Envelope) (rks),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 33 Supplemental Brief to #9 Motion to Transfer filed by Res-Care Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amanda Klett Declaration, #2 Exhibit Jones v. Blue Nile Express) (Harlan, Emery),(ps) Modified on 2/12/2019 (nln). [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying as moot, defendant Res-Care's motion for an extension of time to file its answer, Dkt. #10 . Res-Care may have until February 11, 2019, to supplement its motion to transfer.Each of the individual defendants may have until February 19, 2019, to submit materials supporting or opposing Res-Care's motion to transfer.Plaintiff Tequilla M. Dawson's motion for leave to file a surreply to Res-Care's motion to transfer, Dkt. #19 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until March 4, 2019, to file her surreply.Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to amend her complaint, Dkt. #20 , is GRANTED. Plaintiff may have until March 4, 2019 to file her amended complaint. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 1/30/2019. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER by Defendant Stacey Ellis. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER by Defendant Katie Dziedzic. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 29 ANSWER by Defendant Gary Rudzianis. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 28 ANSWER by Defendant Steven Reinhold. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 19, 2018 Filing 27 ANSWER by Defendant Amanda Kleet. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Katie Dziedzic. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Stacey Ellis. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Amanda Kleet. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Steven Reinhold. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Gary Rudzianis. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 21 Notice by Defendant Res-Care Inc. re: #9 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 20 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Filing 19 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 18 Signed copy of #13 Brief in Opposition filed by Tequilla Marie Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (nln),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 17 Declaration of Grady Crosby III filed by Defendant Res-Care Inc. re: #9 Motion to Transfer, #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Llano Funding Grp., LLC v. Gallo, #2 Exhibit B - Davis v. Rouse) (Harlan, Emery),(ps) Modified on 7/3/2018. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 16 Brief in Reply by Defendant Res-Care Inc. in Support of #9 Motion to Transfer, #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 15 Marshal Service Return Executed as to Gary Rudzianis, et al. Defendants served on 6/29/2018, answer(s) due 7/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Marshal form as to Steven Reinhold, #2 Marshal form as to Amanda Kleet, #3 Marshal form as to Katie Dziedizic, #4 Marshal form as to Stacey Ellis) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 14 Letter from Clerk's Office returning #13 submission to plaintiff for signature. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 13 Brief (unsigned) in Opposition by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson re: #9 Motion to Transfer filed by Res-Care Inc., #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Res-Care Inc. (See dkt. #18 for signed copy.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER by Defendant Res-Care Inc. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Grady Leander Crosby, III for Defendant Res-Care Inc. (Crosby, Grady),(ps) Modified on 6/13/2018: Second Certificate of Service is blank. (lak) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Set Briefing Deadlines as to #9 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin, #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition due 6/25/2018. Defendant's Brief in Reply due 7/2/2018. (nln/jcf),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Res-Care Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO TRANSFER to Eastern District of Wisconsin by Defendant Res-Care Inc. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
June 8, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Emery K. Harlan for Defendant Res-Care Inc. (Harlan, Emery),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
May 24, 2018 Filing 7 Marshal Service Return Executed. Res-Care Inc. served on 5/24/2018, answer due 6/14/2018. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 6 Summonses Issued as to Res-Care Inc., Gary Rudzianis, Steven Reinhold, Amanda Kleet, Stacey Ellis, Katie Dziedzic. Forwarded to U.S. Marshals for service. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Leave to Proceed: Plaintiff granted leave to proceed against Defendants Katie Dziedzic, Stacey Ellis, Amanda Kleet, Steven Reinhold, Res-Care Inc., Gary Rudzianis. Leave to proceed denied and case dismissed against Mary Dixon, Kim Savage, Gabriella Borda-Rossel and Sandra Corey. Service to be made by USMS. Plaintiff's motion for the court's assistance in recruiting her counsel, Dkt. #2 , is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/21/2018. (jef),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on ifp request: Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/16/2017. (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Department of Workforce Development Unemployment Benefit Summary) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 2 Motion for Assistance in Recruiting Counsel by Plaintiff Tequilla Marie Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Attorney Rejection E-mail) (elc),(ps) [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]
October 16, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tequilla Marie Dawson. (Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson) (Attachments: #1 Complaint on non-prisoner complaint form, #2 U.S. EEOC Notice of Right to Sue, #3 Certificate of Service (not filled out)) #4 Cover Letter and Envelope) (elc). [Transferred from wiwd on 3/14/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. Res-Care Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Res-Care Inc
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Represented By: Grady Crosby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriella Borda-Rossel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Reinhold
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Ellis
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Kleet
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Rudzianis
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Dziedzic
Represented By: Emery K Harlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tequilla Marie Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?