Dempsey et al v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc

Plaintiff: Michael Dempsey and Gordon Dickman
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00655
Filed: May 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/21/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/6/20; Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/20; Final Settlement Report due by 3/30/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 4/3/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 4/8/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 4/20/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 6/21/2019. (cl)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (Carrino, Christie)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin M Cook on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Erin M. Cook (Cook, Erin)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie B Carrino on behalf of Kohl's Department Stores Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Christie B. Carrino (Carrino, Christie)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 6/18/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kohl's Department Stores Inc - Waiver sent on 5/24/2019. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 13, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (asc)
May 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kohl's Department Stores Inc. (asc)
May 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 12, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 6, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
May 5, 2019 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT by All Plaintiffs - Civil Cover Sheet. (Cade, Nathaniel)
May 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Kohl's Department Stores Inc by Michael Dempsey, Gordon Dickman. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3101352) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dempsey Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Dempsey Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Dickman Charge of Discrimination, #4 Exhibit D - Dickman Right to Sue Letter)(Cade, Nathaniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dempsey et al v. Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Dempsey
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gordon Dickman
Represented By: Nathaniel Cade, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores Inc
Represented By: Christie B Carrino
Represented By: Erin M Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?