Kendrick v. Brennan et al

Plaintiff: Suan D Kendrick
Defendant: Megan J Brennan, Katherine Vickers, Kim Ashmus, Robert G Prahl, Darlene Abrams, Charles Spahn, Post Master General, Albert Guzman, Jr and Pamela Canada
Case Number: 2:2019cv00659
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman. Judge Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(asc)
June 10, 2019 FILING FEE PAID IN FULL (MK4689078208). (ds)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER re status of case filed by plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. IT IS ORDERED that Kendrick's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee (Docket #2 ) is hereby DENIED. If Kendrick wishes to pursue this lawsuit, she shall pay the filing fee by June 11, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Kendrick's motion to appoint counsel (Docket #5 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (asc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Suan D Kendrick. (asc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Suan D Kendrick. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Suan D Kendrick. (ds)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Suan D Kendrick. Jury Demand (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kendrick v. Brennan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suan D Kendrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan J Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Ashmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert G Prahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Abrams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Spahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Post Master General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Guzman, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?