Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd v. Royal Enfield North America Limited et al
Plaintiff: Flash Electronics Pvt. Ltd. and Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd
Defendant: Royal Enfield North America Limited and Royal Enfield Motors Limited (India)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00736
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Kessel on behalf of Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: Adam J. Kessel (Kessel, Adam)
June 4, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (kah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bonilla, Ricardo)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd. (Bonilla, Ricardo)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 5/17/2019. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint/petition or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
May 16, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Bonilla, Ricardo)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Royal Enfield Motors Limited (India), Royal Enfield North America Limited by Flash Electronics Pvt. Ltd.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3111954) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonilla, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd v. Royal Enfield North America Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flash Electronics Pvt. Ltd.
Represented By: Ricardo Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flash Electronics Pvt Ltd
Represented By: Ricardo Bonilla
Represented By: Stephen Colter
Represented By: Adam Kessel
Represented By: Proshanto Mukherji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Enfield North America Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Enfield Motors Limited (India)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?