Low Life Transport LLC v. Dawes Contract Carriage LLC et al
Plaintiff: Low Life Transport LLC
Defendant: Dawes Contract Carriage LLC, William J Dawes and William Joseph Dawes
Case Number: 2:2019cv00754
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation re #9 Stipulation filed by Dawes Contract Carriage LLC, William Joseph Dawes signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 6/27/2019. Defendants' answer due by August 12, 2019. (cc: all counsel)(aw
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint by William Joseph Dawes, Dawes Contract Carriage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stanaszak, Steven)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F Stanaszak on behalf of William Joseph Dawes, Dawes Contract Carriage LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven F. Stanaszak and Michael K. Roberts (Stanaszak, Steven)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Low Life Transport LLC. Dawes Contract Carriage LLC served on 6/12/2019. (Blitch, Bridgette)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Low Life Transport LLC. William Joseph Dawes served on 6/12/2019. (Blitch, Bridgette)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Low Life Transport LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Blitch, Bridgette)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridgette Blitch on behalf of Low Life Transport LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Bridgette M. Blitch (Blitch, Bridgette)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to William Joseph Dawes, Dawes Contract Carriage LLC. (blr)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Westley, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved in a fillable format and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Westley, Richard)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Low Life Transport LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3115631) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Summons Dawes Contract Carriage LLC, #4 Summons William J Dawes, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Westley, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Low Life Transport LLC v. Dawes Contract Carriage LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawes Contract Carriage LLC
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Dawes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Joseph Dawes
Represented By: Michael K Roberts
Represented By: Steven F Stanaszak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Low Life Transport LLC
Represented By: Richard A Westley
Represented By: Bridgette Blitch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?