Estrada v. Barr et al

Petitioner: MARIA ESTRADA
Respondent: MIRASH DEDVUKA, Kay F Leopold and William Barr
Case Number: 2:2019cv00764
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 08:1447
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Case Terminated (bx)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maria Estrada. (Muwonge, Godfrey)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William Barr, Mirash Dedvuka, Kay F Leopold. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 TO BE RE-FILED; SEE #14 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by William Barr, Mirash Dedvuka, Kay F Leopold. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 (blr).
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E Pawlak Lisa T. Warwick on behalf of William Barr, Mirash Dedvuka, Kay F Leopold. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Pawlak, Brian) Modified on 6/11/2019 (ds).
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Estrada. Mirash Dedvuka served on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maria Estrada. William Barr served on 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 28, 2019 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Mirash Dedvuka, Kay F Leopold. (jcl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Maria Estrada (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Maria Estrada (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Maria Estrada (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Mirash Dedvuka, Kay F Leopold. (bx)
May 24, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (Do not add addresses and capitalize party names) - please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website.The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website - please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents.; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance. (bx)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by MARIA ESTRADA. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Muwonge, Godfrey) (bx).
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by MARIA ESTRADA (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by MARIA ESTRADA (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by MARIA ESTRADA (Muwonge, Godfrey)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION filed by MARIA ESTRADA. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3117365)(Muwonge, Godfrey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARIA ESTRADA
Represented By: Godfrey Y Muwonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MIRASH DEDVUKA
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kay F Leopold
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?