Laude et al v. SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Marcia Laude
Defendant: Terpax Inc., JKL 1-5 Insurance Companies, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare LLC, PQR 1-5 Insurance Companies, SSC Equity Holdings LLC and ABC 1-5 Insurance Companies
Not Yet Classified: Alex M Azar, II and UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00783
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC, Proto Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC, Savaseniorcare LLC, Terpax Inc Notice of Filing (Mashni, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2019 Filing 18 BRIEF in Support filed by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC, Proto Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC, Savaseniorcare LLC, Terpax Inc, Wisconsin Holdco LLC re #11 MOTION to Stay of Action and to Compel Enforcement of Dispute Resolution Program Agreement MOTION to Compel . (Mashni, Jeffrey)
July 15, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #16 Brief in Opposition to Motion. The affidavit should have been filed as a separate entry. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 UNPUBLISHED Decision Sterling Prods. v. Rittech Serv. & Sales filed by All Plaintiffs (O'Neill, Patrick)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #11 MOTION to Stay of Action and to Compel Enforcement of Dispute Resolution Program Agreement MOTION to Compel . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Atty O'Neill)(O'Neill, Patrick)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 4/27/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 12/16/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 12/20/2019; Final Settlement Report due by 4/20/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 4/24/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 4/29/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 6/27/2019. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (nb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Marcia Laude, The Estate of Donald C Laude. (O'Neill, Patrick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC, Proto Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC, Savaseniorcare LLC, Terpax Inc, Wisconsin Holdco LLC Notice of Motion (Carden, Terrence)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay of Action and MOTION to Compel Enforcement of Dispute Resolution Program Agreement by Master Tenant Parent Holdco LLC, Proto Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Equity Holdings LLC, SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC, Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC, Savaseniorcare Consulting LLC, Savaseniorcare LLC, Terpax Inc, Wisconsin Holdco LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Carden, Terrence). Added MOTION to Compel on 6/25/2019 (asc).
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Mashni, Jeffrey)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin E Reyes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Benjamin E. Reyes (Reyes, Benjamin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 6/24/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick C O'Neill on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney(s) appearing: Patrick C. O'Neill (O'Neill, Patrick)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey G Mashni on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey G. Mashni (Mashni, Jeffrey)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence S Carden, III on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Terrence S. Carden, III (Carden, Terrence)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maura S Flaherty on behalf of Alex M Azar, II. Attorney(s) appearing: Maura S. Flaherty (Flaherty, Maura)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (McManus, Stephen)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Joseph McManus on behalf of SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Stephen J McManus (McManus, Stephen)
May 24, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019CV003171 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3119620) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(McManus, Stephen) Modified on 5/28/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laude et al v. SSC Greenfield Operating Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terpax Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKL 1-5 Insurance Companies
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savaseniorcare Administrative Services LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savaseniorcare LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PQR 1-5 Insurance Companies
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Equity Holdings LLC
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC 1-5 Insurance Companies
Represented By: Terrence S Carden, III
Represented By: Jeffrey G Mashni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Maura S Flaherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Laude
Represented By: Patrick C O'Neill
Represented By: Benjamin E Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?