Austin Hardware & Supply Inc v. Allegis Corporation
Plaintiff: Austin Hardware & Supply Inc. and Austin Hardware & Supply Inc
Defendant: Allegis Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00785
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Summons Issued as to Allegis Corporation. (amb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Austin Hardware & Supply Inc (Gregor, Jennifer)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT - Report on Status of Service by Austin Hardware & Supply Inc. (Gregor, Jennifer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Austin Hardware & Supply Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gregor, Jennifer)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 05/28/2019. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. There is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Gregor, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Austin Hardware & Supply Inc.. (Gregor, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Allegis Corporation by Austin Hardware & Supply Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3119777) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gregor, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin Hardware & Supply Inc v. Allegis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allegis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Hardware & Supply Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Austin Hardware & Supply Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Zachary R Willenbrink
Represented By: Thomas L Gemmell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?