Serbinski et al v. Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund et al
Plaintiff: Tony Serbinski
Defendant: M.D. Joel H. Blumin, Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, The Medical College of Wisconsin, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc., Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc, Joel H Blumin and The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc
Not Yet Classified: Upper Peninsula Health Plan, LLC and Upper Peninsula Health Plan LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00794
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tony Serbinski on Plaintiff's First Set of Written Interrogatories to Defendant Joel H. Blumin, M.D., First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant Joel H. Blumin, M.D., Plaintiff's First Set of Written Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Medical College of Wisconsin, Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Medical College of Wisconsin, Plaintiff's First Set of Written Interrogatories Directed to Defendant Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc., and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/19/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 1/15/20; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/20; Final Settlement Report due by 4/22/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 4/24/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 4/30/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/6/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 5/11/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(cl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2019. (Court Reporter Sue Armbruster) (cl)
July 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall R Guse on behalf of Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Randall R. Guse (Guse, Randall)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Status REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Tony Serbinski. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
June 26, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/16/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Joel H Blumin, The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Munson, Jill)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE Statement by Joel H Blumin, The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc. (Munson, Jill)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Joel H Blumin, The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc.(Munson, Jill)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund.(Burnett, George)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE Statement by Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc. (Johnson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc.(Johnson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Johnson on behalf of Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael L. Johnson (Johnson, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Burnett, George)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by George Burnett on behalf of Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund. Attorney(s) appearing: George Burnett (Burnett, George)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Serbinski. Upper Peninsula Health Plan LLC served on 6/10/2019. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Serbinski. Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund served on 6/3/2019. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Serbinski. The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc served on 6/4/2019. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tony Serbinski. Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc served on 6/4/2019. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joel H Blumin - Waiver sent on 6/6/2019. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
May 29, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tony Serbinski. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Petrucelli, Vincent)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Tony Serbinski. (Petrucelli, Vincent)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Tony Serbinski. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3120849) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Upper Peninsula Health Plan, LLC, #3 Summons Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund, #4 Summons Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc., #5 Summons The Medical College of Wisconsin, Inc., #6 Summons Joel H. Blumin, M.D.)(Petrucelli, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serbinski et al v. Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Joel H. Blumin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Injured Patients and Families Compensation Fund
Represented By: George Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical College of Wisconsin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Froedtert Memorial Lutheran Hospital Inc
Represented By: Michael L Johnson
Represented By: Randall R Guse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel H Blumin
Represented By: Jill M Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical College of Wisconsin Inc
Represented By: Jill M Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Upper Peninsula Health Plan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Upper Peninsula Health Plan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Serbinski
Represented By: Vincent R Petrucelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?