Graves v. Bridgeman Foods et al
Plaintiff: Jeremi D Graves
Defendant: Bridgeman Foods and Rolando Maldonado
Case Number: 2:2019cv00798
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #10 Notice of Appearance filed by Bridgeman Foods, Rolando Maldonado ; Electronically filed documents should not be scanned whenever possible. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A Krukowski on behalf of Bridgeman Foods, Rolando Maldonado. (jcl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bridgeman Foods - Waiver sent on 6/19/2019. (jcl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rolando Maldonado - Waiver sent on 6/19/2019. (jcl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed as to defendant Bridgeman Foods (jcl)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 US Marshal 285 Form returned executed as to defendant Rolando Maldonado (jcl)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Jeremi D Graves. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (bx)
June 11, 2019 TRANSMIT Order, Complaint, Notice, Waiver and Consent Forms to US Marshal for service upon defendants (jcl)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/10/19 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. The U.S. Marshals Service shall serve a copy of the complaint, a waiver of service form and/or the summons, and this order upon defendants. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (jad) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jad).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Jeremi D Graves. (ds)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Bridgeman Foods and Rolando Maldonado filed by Jeremi D Graves. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Right to Sue Letter))(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graves v. Bridgeman Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremi D Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridgeman Foods
Represented By: Deborah A Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando Maldonado
Represented By: Deborah A Krukowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?