Park Bank v. Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC et al
Appellant: Park Bank
Appellee: Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC and Office of the US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00807
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) by Park Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, L)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal (TRANSCRIPT) re #4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transcript for Hearing Held on May 29, 2019)(kan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal (TRANSCRIPT) re #4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (kan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental Transmittal of Record on Appeal (TRANSCRIPTS) re #4 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Transcript for Hearing Held on March 13, 2019, #2 Transcript for Hearing Held on April 29, 2019, #3 Transcript for Hearing Held on May 15, 2019)(kan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-2028. (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Adversary Documents 1-2, 6-7, 9-10, 13-15, 17, 19-23, 25, 27-28 and 30, #3 Document 34 - Notice of Appellant Park Bank's Written Request for Transcripts, #4 Main Bankruptcy Case Documents 1-2, 11-13, 20, 24, 25, 27-29, 34, 36, 47, and 52, #5 Main Bankruptcy Case Documents 54-55, 66-68, 71, and 90, #6 Main Bankruptcy Case Documents 64 and 65) (ljr)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/17/19 granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint) by Park Bank. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, L)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 19-2028; (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet)(ljr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park Bank v. Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Park Bank
Represented By: L Katie Mason
Represented By: Joseph E Fenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Integral 2545 Stowell, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan V Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Represented By: Laura D Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?