Hoeller v. Carroll University et al
Plaintiff: Timothy L Hoeller
Defendant: Cindy Gnadinger, Jane Doe, Carroll University and Catherine Jorgens
Case Number: 2:2019cv00850
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing: New information not voluntarily released by Defendant, Carroll University assigns Tara Husemann as Witness and Identifies filed by Timothy L Hoeller. (blr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing: Copy of HR Letter dated April 25, 2017 notifying of Standard Procedures to Close Adjunct Positions filed by Timothy L Hoeller. (blr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing: Rights of Plaintiff in regards to EEOC Complaint filed by Timothy L Hoeller. (blr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing: Copy of Plaintiff's Adjunct Reference Manual, Spring 2017 filed by Timothy L Hoeller. (blr)
July 31, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Timothy L Hoeller re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice - New Information, #2 Notice - Constituent Services)(asc)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by Carroll University re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . (Greathouse, Denise)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Carroll University. (Greathouse, Denise)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 COURTESY COPY of State Court Pleadings filed by plaintiff (asc)
June 20, 2019 Due to non-consent, this case has been randomly reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph no longer assigned to the case. (blr)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Carroll University. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Greathouse, Denise)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carroll University - Waiver sent on 6/7/2019. (Greathouse, Denise)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Denise OL Greathouse on behalf of Carroll University. Attorney(s) appearing: Denise Greathouse (Greathouse, Denise)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Timothy L Hoeller. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy L Hoeller. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Jury Demand. (Filing Fee PAID $400.00; MK4689078161) (Service Packet Issued) (Attachments: #1 Complaint-Summary, #2 Exhibits)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoeller v. Carroll University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gnadinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carroll University
Represented By: Denise OL Greathouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Jorgens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy L Hoeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?