Symbology Innovations LLC v. Dramm International Inc
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC and Symbology Innovations LLC
Defendant: Dramm Internationa, Inc. and Dramm International Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00853
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Symbology Innovations LLC. Dramm International Inc served on 6/17/2019. (McArthur, M)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 6/28/19 granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dramm International Inc answer due 8/7/2019.. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by Dramm International Inc. (Malaney, Kevin)
June 12, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Dramm International Inc. (asc)
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Dramm International Inc.(sent via USPS) (jcl)
June 10, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 7, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint, filed by Symbology Innovations LLC ; Attachments to documents should be clearly described.(Exhibit A, Exhibit B etc.) This document does not need to be re-filed.; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Dramm Internationa, Inc. by Symbology Innovations, LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3131650) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Patent 8424752, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons)(McArthur, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Symbology Innovations LLC v. Dramm International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dramm Internationa, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dramm International Inc
Represented By: Sarah E Rieger
Represented By: Kevin J Malaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations, LLC
Represented By: M. Grant McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Symbology Innovations LLC
Represented By: M Grant McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?