Biese v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin John Biese
Defendant: CO Kammer, Sgt John Lannoye, Sgt Kyle Cook and Officer Lannoye
Case Number: 2:2019cv00874
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Benjamin Biese regarding initial partial filing fee. (mac)
July 15, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $.93, receipt number MK4689-078738. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/28/2019. On or before 7/19/2019 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $0.93 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Benjamin Biese and Warden at Green Bay Correctional Institution)(cb)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Benjamin John Biese. (mac)
June 18, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent. (copy mailed to Plaintiff) (kah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Benjamin John Biese. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Benjamin Biese re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Benjamin John Biese. (lh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Benjamin John Biese. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biese v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CO Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt John Lannoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt Kyle Cook
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lannoye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin John Biese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?