Holt v. DCI Marketing Inc
Plaintiff: Chadwell Holt
Defendant: DCI Marketing, Inc. and DCI Marketing Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00877
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by DCI Marketing Inc re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts IV, V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Gehbauer, Ryan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts IV, V, VI and VII of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Under Rule 12(b)(6) by DCI Marketing Inc. (Gehbauer, Ryan)
August 7, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by DCI Marketing Inc.(Gehbauer, Ryan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Chadwell Holt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Carroll, Douglas)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/10/2019. By 7/24/2019 plaintiff to file either amended complaint or response to defendant's motion to dismiss. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by DCI Marketing Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gehbauer, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support filed by DCI Marketing Inc re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, V, VI and VII Under Rule 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unreported Cases)(Gehbauer, Ryan)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV, V, VI and VII Under Rule 12(b)(6) by DCI Marketing Inc. (Gehbauer, Ryan)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/20/2019 re #3 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint. The plaintiff filed a response to the defendant's motion, indicating that plaintiff does not object to the defendant's requested extension of time. Dkt. No. 5. The court GRANTS the motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 3, 2019. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Chadwell Holt re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . (Carroll, Douglas)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Chadwell Holt. (Carroll, Douglas)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by DCI Marketing Inc. (Gehbauer, Ryan)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by DCI Marketing, Inc. Notice to Plaintiff of Removal of Action (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gehbauer, Ryan) Modified on 6/14/2019 (amb).
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by DCI Marketing, Inc. from Milwaukee Circuit Court, Case Number: 19-cv-3327 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3137197) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gehbauer, Ryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl). Modified on 6/14/2019 (amb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. DCI Marketing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwell Holt
Represented By: Douglas J Carroll, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCI Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan J Gehbauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCI Marketing Inc
Represented By: Ryan J Gehbauer
Represented By: Laura Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?