Strurgill et al v. Bloomin' Brands Inc
Plaintiff: Barbara Strurgill
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands Inc
Not Yet Classified: United Healthcare
Case Number: 2:2019cv00882
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/5/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 9/17/19 at 11:00 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/2/19 denying #10 Motion to Remand. (cc: all counsel) (jad)
July 17, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Dale O. Thornsjo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thornsjo, Dale)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Bloomin' Brands Inc re #10 MOTION to Remand . (Meyer, Lance)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bloomin' Brands Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thornsjo, Dale)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Letter Letter, #2 Affidavit Affidavit)(Houck, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #1 Ex. 2 United HealthCare Insurance Company Counterclaim Against Bloomin' Brands, Inc. filed by Bloomin' Brands Inc. (Meyer, Lance)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bloomin' Brands Inc.(Meyer, Lance)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by United Healthcare. (Mayer, Matthew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United Healthcare. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mayer, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to all counsel requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lance D Meyer on behalf of Bloomin' Brands Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Lance D. Meyer (Meyer, Lance)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Bloomin' Brands Inc. (Thornsjo, Dale)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dale O Thornsjo on behalf of Bloomin' Brands Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Dale O. Thornsjo (Thornsjo, Dale)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bloomin' Brands Inc (Thornsjo, Dale)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Bloomin' Brands Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019CV002822 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3137965) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Additional documents filed to date, #3 Exhibit 3 Defendant's Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thornsjo, Dale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strurgill et al v. Bloomin' Brands Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bloomin' Brands Inc
Represented By: Dale O Thornsjo
Represented By: Lance D Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Strurgill
Represented By: Thomas K Houck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United Healthcare
Represented By: Matthew S Mayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?