Hultgren v. Mosaic 360 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Leslie Hultgren
Defendant: Navigen Wealth Management, LLC, Mosaic 360, LLC, Mosaic 360 LLC, Navigen LLC and Navigen Wealth Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00886
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2019 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 8/27/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Navigen LLC - Waiver sent on 7/23/2019. (Lueder, Michael)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Mosaic 360 LLC, Navigen Wealth Management LLC filed by Leslie Hultgren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lueder, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Leslie Hultgren. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lueder, Michael)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mosaic 360 LLC - Waiver sent on 6/19/2019. (Lueder, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Mosaic 360, LLC, Navigen Wealth Management, LLC by Leslie Hultgren. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3138415) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Lueder, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hultgren v. Mosaic 360 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigen Wealth Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic 360, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic 360 LLC
Represented By: Tiffany E Woelfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigen LLC
Represented By: Chad R Levanetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigen Wealth Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Hultgren
Represented By: Michael C Lueder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?