Lanning v. Gateway Technical College
Plaintiff: Carissa Lanning
Defendant: Gateway Technical College
Case Number: 2:2019cv00890
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gateway Technical College. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Davis, Lindsey)
July 26, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to BOTH PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Gateway Technical College.(Davis, Lindsey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey W Davis on behalf of Gateway Technical College. Attorney(s) appearing: Lindsey W. Davis (Davis, Lindsey)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Scullen on behalf of Gateway Technical College. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Scullen (Scullen, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carissa Lanning. Gateway Technical College served on 7/3/2019. (Patchan, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 6/19/19. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint/petition or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
June 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to Gateway Technical College. (kah)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Carissa Lanning (Patchan, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The county code has been modified - please remember to choose the county for the first named plaintiff. The attached summons was not prepared using the version found on our website or was not saved properly - please follow the instructions and RESUBMIT the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. ; Please refer to the # attorney case opening instructions, the # summons instructions and the # party name guidelines found in the user manual for further guidance (kah)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Gateway Technical College by Carissa Lanning. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3139187) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Patchan, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lanning v. Gateway Technical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Technical College
Represented By: Lindsey W Davis
Represented By: Sean M Scullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Lanning
Represented By: Andrew S Patchan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?