Gentex Corporation v. Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc

Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Defendant: Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00901
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan A David on behalf of Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan A. David (David, Jonathan)
August 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J Covaleski on behalf of Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul J. Covaleski (Covaleski, Paul)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/19/19. Interim Settlement Report due by 2/25/20; Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/20; Final Settlement Report due by 5/26/20; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 5/29/20; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 6/3/20. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 6/15/20 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order.(cc: all counsel)(cl)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2019. (Court Reporter Sue Armbruster) (cl)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Gentex Corporation. (Jantzi, Nicole)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Gregor, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Gregor on behalf of Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jennifer L. Gregor (Gregor, Jennifer)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gentex Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Jantzi, Nicole)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/16/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc - Waiver sent on 6/20/2019. (Jantzi, Nicole)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc. (asc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian B Brooks on behalf of Gentex Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Ian B. Brooks (Brooks, Ian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul M Schoenhard on behalf of Gentex Corporation. Attorney(s) appearing: Paul M. Schoenhard (Schoenhard, Paul)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (Jantzi, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gentex Corporation. (Jantzi, Nicole)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc by Gentex Corporation. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3141681) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,148,813, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Jantzi, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gentex Corporation v. Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traffic and Parking Control Co Inc
Represented By: Jennifer L Gregor
Represented By: Paul J Covaleski
Represented By: Shane Delsman
Represented By: Jonathan A David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gentex Corporation
Represented By: Nicole M Jantzi
Represented By: Paul M Schoenhard
Represented By: Ian B Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?