Bakala v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKALA
Defendant: MARK J HAZUDA, WILLIAM P BARR, KENNETH T CUCCINELLI and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00903
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller, Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(asc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bakala. Mark J Hazuda served on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Block, Harold)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bakala. Kenneth T Cuccinelli served on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Block, Harold)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bakala. Kevin McAleenan served on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Block, Harold)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Bakala. William P Barr served on 6/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Block, Harold)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Bakala.(Block, Harold)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by David Bakala. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Block, Harold)
June 20, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by DAVID BAKALA (Block, Harold)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by DAVID BAKALA (Block, Harold)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by DAVID BAKALA (Block, Harold)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by DAVID BAKALA (Block, Harold)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William P Barr, Kevin McAleenan, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Mark J Hazuda DAVID BAKALA by DAVID BAKALA. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3141825) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Block, Harold) Modified on 6/28/2019 (asc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakala v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKALA
Represented By: Harold D Block
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK J HAZUDA
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P BARR
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KENNETH T CUCCINELLI
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?