Strong Microbials Inc v. Mann Lake Ltd
Plaintiff: Strong Microbials, Inc. and Strong Microbials Inc
Defendant: Mann Lake Ltd. and Mann Lake Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv00904
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 8/8/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 2/25/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 5/26/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 5/29/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 6/3/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 8/8/2019. (Court Reporter John Schindhelm) (nb)
August 6, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT VERIFIED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Strong Microbials Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Howe, Stephen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 17 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Strong Microbials Inc. (Howe, Stephen)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Strong Microbials Inc of Withdrawal of Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Howe, Stephen)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/18/2019 GRANTING #15 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Adjourn. Scheduling Conference previously set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM has been RE-SET for 8/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan now due by 8/5/2019. All other provisions of #9 Notice of Hearing remain in effect. (cc: all counsel) (jm)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Adjourn and Reschedule the Scheduling Conference by Strong Microbials Inc. (Howe, Stephen)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) by Mann Lake Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hanus, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Scott W. Johnston in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Strong Microbials' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C - T.S.D.R. Record for U.S. Registration No. 5,482,999)(Hanus, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Stuart Volby in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Strong Microbials' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EMSL Test Reports dated 6/16/19, #2 Exhibit B - EMSL Test Reports dated 7/15/19)(Hanus, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Mann Lake Ltd re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Hanus, David)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE Statement by Mann Lake Ltd. (Hanus, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/30/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Strong Microbials Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Howe, Stephen)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David J Hanus on behalf of Mann Lake Ltd. Attorney(s) appearing: David J. Hanus (Hanus, David)
June 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to Mann Lake Ltd. (asc)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Strong Microbials Inc. (Howe, Stephen)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Strong Microbials Inc (Howe, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks (asc)
June 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF in Support filed by Strong Microbials, Inc. re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Stephen Howe in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Howe Declaration, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Vyacheslav Strogolov in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum)(Howe, Stephen)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 WITHDRAWN; PURSUANT TO #16 NOTICE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Strong Microbials, Inc.. (Howe, Stephen) Modified on 7/31/2019 (asc).
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Mann Lake Ltd. by Strong Microbials, Inc.. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3141831)(Howe, Stephen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong Microbials Inc v. Mann Lake Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Lake Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mann Lake Ltd
Represented By: Scott W Johnston
Represented By: David J Hanus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strong Microbials, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen R Howe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strong Microbials Inc
Represented By: Stephen R Howe
Represented By: Ann M Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?