Erdmann v. Packaging Corporation of America et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Erdmann
Defendant: Fred Netz, Aldrick Norwood, Mark Romaniuk, Robert Degarer, Packaging Corporation of America, Basant Ahluwalia and M Kowlzan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00905
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/9/2019. Plaintiff to FILE an amended complaint by 8/23/2019, or this action will be dismissed without further notice and without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Erdmann)(jm)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER RESPONSE filed by Michelle Erdmann re #6 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(asc)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 7/12/2019. #3 Court's Denial of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is VACATED; #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff to FILE an amended complaint by 8/2/2019 or this action will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Erdmann)(jm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE filed by Michelle Erdmann re #3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (asc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Michelle Erdmann. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 VACATED pursuant to #6 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 6/24/2019 DENYING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. Plaintiff to FILE an amended motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by 7/15/2019 or this action will be dismissed without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Michelle Erdmann) (jm) Modified on 7/15/2019 (blr).
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Michelle Erdmann. (ds)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Michelle Erdmann. Consent form distributed for Magistrate Judge David E. Jones. Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erdmann v. Packaging Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Netz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldrick Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Romaniuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Degarer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Packaging Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Basant Ahluwalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Kowlzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Erdmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?