Morales Torres v. Schmidt et al
Petitioner: Francisco Roman Morales Torres
Respondent: Matthew T Albence, Louis Zamora, Sheriff Dale J Schmidt and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00929
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William C Griesbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Filing 13 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 8/6/2019. (cc: all counsel)(cav) (Main Document 13 replaced on 8/6/2019 to correct typo in name) (cav).
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 DECISION and ORDER denying without prejudice #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Francisco Roman Morales Torres (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY filed by Francisco Roman Morales Torres in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fleming, Mark)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF filed by Matthew T Albence, Kevin McAleenan, Dale J Schmidt, Louis Zamora In Opposition to the Petition For A Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration)(Warwick, Lisa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Matthew T Albence, Kevin McAleenan, Dale J Schmidt, Louis Zamora. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Warwick, Lisa)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa T Warwick on behalf of Matthew T Albence, Kevin McAleenan, Dale J Schmidt, Louis Zamora. Attorney(s) appearing: AUSA Lisa T. Warwick (Warwick, Lisa)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service of Petition by Certified Mail served upon US Attorney General on 7/1/19 (lh)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service of Petition by Certified Mail; Sheriff Dale Schmidt served on 6/28/2019. (mac)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service of Petition by Certified Mail; Milwaukee US Attorney served on 6/28/2019. (mac)
June 27, 2019 Copy of Petition #1 and Order #4 sent via Certified Mail to Sheriff Dale Schmidt, Office of the US Attorney Milwaukee, US Attorney General, US Immigration & Customs Enforcement, and Dept of Homeland Security (cav)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 SCREENING ORDER. It is ordered that, no later than 20 days from the date of service of the petition, Respondents must file an answer showing cause, if any, why a writ should not issue with respect to the petition for habeas corpus. Petitioner shall file any reply in support of his petition within 14 days of the filing of the response. The clerk is directed to serve the petition and order. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Francisco Roman Morales Torres. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Fleming, Mark)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark M Fleming on behalf of Francisco Roman Morales Torres. Attorney(s) appearing: Mark Fleming (Fleming, Mark)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Francisco Roman Morales Torres. ( Filing Fee PAID $5 receipt number BWIEDC-3147230) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Fleming, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2019: #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales Torres v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Louis Zamora
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sheriff Dale J Schmidt
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Lisa T Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Francisco Roman Morales Torres
Represented By: Mark M Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?