Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund et al v. Uni-Pump Inc
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund and Scott J Redman
Defendant: Uni-Pump, Inc. and Uni-Pump Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00933
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Case Terminated pursuant to #5 . (blr)
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Scott J Redman. (Ahrens, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Scott J Redman. Uni-Pump Inc served on 7/2/2019. (Ahrens, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Ahrens, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Ahrens, Christopher)
June 27, 2019 Summons Issued as to Uni-Pump Inc. (asc)
June 26, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Uni-Pump, Inc. by Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund, Scott J Redman. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3147982) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ahrens, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund et al v. Uni-Pump Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Building Trades United Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J Redman
Represented By: Christopher J Ahrens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Pump, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uni-Pump Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?