Boehm v. Moncher
Plaintiff: Scott Boehm
Defendant: Richard Moncher
Case Number: 2:2019cv00943
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Boehm. Richard Moncher served on 8/19/2019. (Kleinman, Nathaniel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Scott Boehm. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kleinman, Nathaniel)
August 6, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed no later than 8/20/2019; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
July 9, 2019 Summons Issued as to Richard Moncher. (asc)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by Scott Boehm (McCulloch, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal regarding a Copyright. (via US mail to Register of Copyrights)(blr)
June 28, 2019 Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: The attached summons was not saved in the correct format and cannot be issued electronically. Please follow the instructions and resubmit the summons using the event Request for Issuance of Summons which is found under the heading other documents. Please refer to the # summons instructions for further guidance. (blr)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Richard Moncher by Scott Boehm. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3149248) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Side by Side Comparison, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McCulloch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boehm v. Moncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Boehm
Represented By: Kevin P McCulloch
Represented By: Nathaniel A Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Moncher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?