Arenz et al v. Inmate Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sheenah Arenz
Defendant: Marius Nesby and Inmate Services Corporation
Not Yet Classified: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services and United Healthcare
Case Number: 2:2019cv00949
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby.(McGaver, Steven)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby filed by Sheenah Arenz.(Levine, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of the Parties to Follow Joint Discovery Plan by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. (McGaver, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 7/19/2019. Interim Settlement Report due by 2/25/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2020; Final Settlement Report due by 5/26/2020; Motions in Limine and Daubert Motions due by 5/29/2020; Final/Joint Pretrial Report due by 2:00 PM on 6/3/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 6/15/2020 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(nb)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 7/19/2019. (Court Reporter Susan Armbruster) (nb)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. (McGaver, Steven)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby.(McGaver, Steven)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Mills, Sara)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Sheenah Arenz. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Levine, Robert)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J P Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 7/16/2019. (cc: all counsel)(jm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C McGaver on behalf of Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. Attorney(s) appearing: Steven C. McGaver (McGaver, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Sheenah Arenz. (Levine, Robert)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. (Mills, Sara)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara C Mills on behalf of Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. Attorney(s) appearing: Sara C. Mills (Mills, Sara)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel C Hall, Jr on behalf of Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby. Attorney(s) appearing: Samuel C. Hall, Jr. (Hall, Samuel)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inmate Services Corporation, Marius Nesby from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19-CV-2536 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3150235) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Admission of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Retainer)(Hall, Samuel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/28/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jcl).
June 28, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arenz et al v. Inmate Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheenah Arenz
Represented By: Jonathan J Cattey
Represented By: Robert A Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: State of Wisconsin Department of Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: United Healthcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marius Nesby
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inmate Services Corporation
Represented By: Sara C Mills
Represented By: Samuel C Hall, Jr
Represented By: Steven C McGaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?