Baggs et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC

Plaintiff: Joshua Baggs, Robert Baggs and River Hill Farms Inc
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00966
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Bobby R. Burchfield in Response to Plaintiffs' August 21, 2019 Letter. (Burchfield, Bobby)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/23/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 9/3/19 at 11:00 a.m. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide names of attorneys participating in call. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from counsel in related, class action (19-cv-85) re: requesting joint telephone status conference. (Blythin, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CNH Industrial America LLC - Waiver sent on 7/12/2019. (Rainwater, John)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to CNH Industrial America LLC. (bx)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Blythin, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (related to 19-cv-85-LA) with Jury Demand; against CNH Industrial America LLC by Robert Baggs, River Hill Farms Inc, Joshua Baggs. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3154245) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Defendant)(Blythin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baggs et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Baggs
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Baggs
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: River Hill Farms Inc
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?