Grant et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Plaintiff: Grant Brothers Farm, Josh Grant and John Grant
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00967
Filed: July 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT by John Grant, Josh Grant, Grant Brothers Farm re: jurisdiction. (Blythin, John)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 STATEMENT by CNH Industrial America LLC regarding Jurisdiction. (Murphy, Patrick)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lynn Adelman: Status Conference held on 9/3/19. Court holds status conference as requested by plaintiffs to discuss motion to consolidate and other matters. Court states that it is not inclined to formally consolidate the cases at this time but agrees that some coordination is appropriate. Because all cases are assigned to Judge Adelman, they are already informally consolidated. Defendant has noted problems with plaintiffs' jurisdictional allegations. Parties agree that, within one week, they will each file statements containing the factual information that determines the citizenship of each party to each case. Court notes that the statements should, among other things, identify the members of partnerships, limited liability companies, and other unincorporated associations. In an effort to avoid potentially duplicative briefing, the court will, after confirming that diversity jurisdiction exists, decide the motion to dismiss in the proposed class action (19-C-85) based on the existing briefs and take a look at the motions for more definite statements filed in Godwin and Grant. The court will read defendants briefs in support of the motions to dismiss filed in other cases and consider the arguments made there to the extent relevant to the motion filed in the class action. However, briefing on all motions is stayed pending further court order, meaning that the plaintiffs are not obligated to file response briefs in any case in which such briefs have not already been filed. If the court determines that additional briefing is needed to resolve either the motion to dismiss in the class action or the motions for more definite statements, the court will notify the parties. (jad)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Murphy, Patrick)
September 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 9/3/2019 at 2:00 PM By Telephone before Judge Lynn Adelman. (jad)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #7 Letter ; The exhibit to this document should have been filed as an attachment. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (jcl)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from Bobby R. Burchfield in Response to Plaintiffs' August 21, 2019 Letter. (Burchfield, Bobby)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement by CNH Industrial America LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Unreported Authority Cited in Defendant CNH Industrial America LLC's Motion for a More Definite Statement)(Murphy, Patrick)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/23/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic status conference will be held on 9/3/19 at 11:00 a.m. Participants need to call in for the conference as follows: dial access number 1-877-336-1839. You will be prompted for an access code (4144803) and a security code (1234). Once that information is entered participants will be placed on hold until we access the call. Counsel must email the court prior to the call at AdelmanPO@wied.uscourts.gov to provide names of attorneys participating in call. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from counsel in related, class action (19-cv-85) re: requesting joint telephone status conference. (Blythin, John)
August 12, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CNH Industrial America LLC - Waiver sent on 7/12/2019. (Rainwater, John)
July 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to CNH Industrial America LLC. (jcl)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
July 5, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by John Grant, Josh Grant, Grant Brothers Farm. (Blythin, John)
July 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (related to 19-cv-85-LA) with Jury Demand; against CNH Industrial America LLC by Josh Grant, Grant Brothers Farm, John Grant. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3154269) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons on Defendant)(Blythin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grant et al v. CNH Industrial America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Brothers Farm
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josh Grant
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Grant
Represented By: John D Blythin
Represented By: Mark A Eldridge
Represented By: Robert L Beard, Jr
Represented By: John M Rainwater
Represented By: Shpetim Ademi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNH Industrial America LLC
Represented By: Patrick J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?