Ali v. Qure Medical
Plaintiff: Fouad Ali
Defendant: Qure Medical
Case Number: 2:2019cv00971
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Qure Medical re #13 MOTION for Order Directing Defendant to Provide Documents. (Primm, Adam)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Order Directing defendant to provide documents by Fouad Ali. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(amb)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/14/2019. The court issued an order requiring the plaintiff to file either an amended complaint or a response to the defendant's motion to dismiss by August 28, 2019. Dkt. No. 9. On August 13, 2019, the plaintiff filed a motion for an extension of time. Dkt. No. 11. The plaintiff's motion states that he is requesting more time in order to "have [his] lawyer look this file over," and he asks for "another month for [his] lawyer to view." The court GRANTS the plaintiff's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file either an amended complaint or a response to the defendant's motion to dismiss is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 30, 2019. No further extensions will be granted without a showing of good cause. The court notes that the docket in this case indicates that the plaintiff is proceeding without a lawyer; if, as the plaintiff's motion seems to indicate, he has a lawyer advising him, that attorney should file a notice of appearance in this case. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Fouad Ali) (cb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by plaintiff Fouad Ali (vkb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Qure Medical. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Raynor, Agatha)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/9/2019 reminding the Plaintiff of the option to file an amended complaint in lieu of responding to the Defendant's #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. An amended complaint or a response to the partial motion to dismiss due by August 28, 2019. (cc: all counsel and copy sent to the Plaintiff by US Mail on 8/9/2019)(kgw)
August 8, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to defendant requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Qure Medical (Raynor, Agatha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE Statement by Qure Medical. (Raynor, Agatha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF in Support filed by Qure Medical re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint . (Raynor, Agatha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Qure Medical. (Raynor, Agatha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Agatha K Raynor on behalf of Qure Medical. Attorney(s) appearing: Agatha Raynor (Raynor, Agatha)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fouad Ali. Qure Medical served on 7/17/2019. (amb)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Fouad Ali. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (ds)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Fouad Ali filed by Fouad Ali. Consent forms distributed for Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin. Jury Demand. (Filing Fee PAID ; MK4689078559) (Service Packet Issued via USPS) (Attachments: #1 Dismissal Letter and Dismissal and Notice of Rights (Right to Sue Letter))(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Qure Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qure Medical
Represented By: Adam E Primm
Represented By: Ashley E Webber
Represented By: Agatha K Raynor
Represented By: Eric Baisden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fouad Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?