Estate of Brian Stiner et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Brian Stiner
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc, Toyota Motor Corporation and Unknown
Not Yet Classified: Secura Insurance Company and Anthem Bluecross Blueshield
Case Number: 2:2019cv00998
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Estate of Brian Stiner. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Bayer, Nathan)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Toyota Motor Corporation's ANSWER to Crossclaim re #5 of Secura Insurance Company filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Dorenkamp, Theodore)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Toyota Motor Corporation. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Dorenkamp, Theodore)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff and Deft Toyota Motor Corp requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E Jones be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (kah)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Secura Insurance Company. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Theesfeld, Phillip)
August 6, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to all parties requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Secura Insurance Company. (Theesfeld, Phillip)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint AND CROSSCLAIM filed by Secura Insurance Company. (Theesfeld, Phillip)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip C Theesfeld on behalf of Secura Insurance Company. Attorney(s) appearing: Phillip C. Theesfeld (Theesfeld, Phillip)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Toyota Motor Corporation.(Dorenkamp, Theodore)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Toyota Motor Corporation. (Dorenkamp, Theodore)
July 12, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Toyota Motor Corporation from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 2019cv003425 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3160181) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dorenkamp, Theodore)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Brian Stiner et al v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Sales USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Motor Corporation
Represented By: Theodore Dorenkamp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Brian Stiner
Represented By: Nathan J Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Secura Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip C Theesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthem Bluecross Blueshield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?