Aguilar et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Plaintiff: Santos Aguilar
Defendant: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation, Walmart, Inc., John Doe, Walmart Inc and Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp
Not Yet Classified: Alex M Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2019cv01041
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 09/12/2019 GRANTING #11 Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel) (amb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Walmart Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Andrews, Eric)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Alex M Azar, II. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Constantine, Emily)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Walmart Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Crosby, Grady)
August 5, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to involuntary plaintiff Alex M Azar II requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (amb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Ann Constantine on behalf of Alex M Azar, II. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily A. Constantine (Constantine, Emily)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Walmart Inc.(Andrews, Eric)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE Statement by Walmart Inc. (Crosby, Grady)
July 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Grady Crosby, III on behalf of Walmart Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Grady L. Crosby III (Crosby, Grady)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE Statement by Santos Aguilar. (Knurr, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Santos Aguilar. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knurr, Timothy)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 DISREGARD. SEE #3 . Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Santos Aguilar. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Knurr, Timothy) Modified on 7/24/2019 (amb).
July 19, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from State of Wisconsin Circuit Court Kenosha County, Case Number: 2019CV000697 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3167097) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Andrews, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aguilar et al v. Walmart Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Eric L Andrews
Represented By: Grady Crosby, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compcare Health Services Insurance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Emily Ann Constantine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santos Aguilar
Represented By: Timothy S Knurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?