Kirsch et al v. World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin et al
Plaintiff: Heather Kirsch and Brian Kirsch
Defendant: World Acceptance Corporation and World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin
Case Number: 2:2019cv01047
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Nancy Joseph
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Caleb Hartsock in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Arbitration Agreement)(Kruse, Natalia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support filed by World Acceptance Corporation, World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin re #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Kruse, Natalia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by World Acceptance Corporation, World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin. (Kruse, Natalia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by World Acceptance Corporation, World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin.(Kruse, Natalia)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M Lawless on behalf of World Acceptance Corporation, World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa M. Lawless (Lawless, Lisa)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Kawski, Marci)
August 29, 2019 NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANTS requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia S Kruse on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Natalia S. Kruse (Kruse, Natalia)
August 28, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: All Defendants. Answer due 9/19/2019. (llc)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER Approving Stipulation #8 filed by World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin, World Acceptance Corporation signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/28/2019. (cc: all counsel)(llc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer)(Kawski, Marci)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marci V Kawski on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Marci Kawski (Kawski, Marci)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. World Acceptance Corporation served on 8/13/2019. (Pagel, Briane)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin served on 8/8/2019. (Pagel, Briane)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Brian Kirsch, Heather Kirsch. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pagel, Briane)
July 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (asc)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Pagel, Briane)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons by All Plaintiffs (Pagel, Briane)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Brian Kirsch, Heather Kirsch. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3168635)(Pagel, Briane) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirsch et al v. World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Acceptance Corporation
Represented By: Natalia S Kruse
Represented By: Marci V Kawski
Represented By: Lisa M Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Finance Corporation of Wisconsin
Represented By: Natalia S Kruse
Represented By: Marci V Kawski
Represented By: Lisa M Lawless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Kirsch
Represented By: Briane F Pagel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kirsch
Represented By: Briane F Pagel, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?