United States of America v. Aleksinski
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sheryl A. Aleksinski and Sheryl Aleksinski
Case Number: 2:2019cv01072
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 9/5/2019 re #4 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading to the complaint is EXTENDED until the end of the day on September 27, 2019. No further extensions will be granted without a showing of good cause. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Sheryl Aleksinski) (cb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by defendant Sheryl Aleksinski (vkb)
August 16, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Pamela Pepper. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case. (kah)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by United States of America. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Aberg, Eric)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 7/26/19. Plaintiff must file proof of service of the complaint/petition or a report on the status of service for each defendant within 45 days of the date of this order. Please note that there is no document attached to this order. (cc: all counsel)(kah)
July 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to Sheryl Aleksinski. (kah)
July 25, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge David E Jones ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sheryl A. Aleksinski by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Aberg, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Aleksinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl A. Aleksinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Aleksinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Eric M Aberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?