Spyra et al v. The Heartland Christian Advisors et al
Plaintiff: Spurmaxim Inc Profit Sharing Plan, Robert W Thomas, Eric Spyra, Robert W. Thomas Roth IRA and Robert W Thomas Roth IRA
Defendant: J. William Gailbreath, George D. Guritz, The Heartland Christian Advisors, George D Guritz, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc and J William Gailbreath
Case Number: 2:2019cv01110
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Referring Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/9/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 10/24/19 at 1:15 p.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Murdock, Anthony)
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 DEFENDANTS THE HEARTLAND CHRISTIAN ADVISORS, INC. AND J. WILLIAM GAILBREATH'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc.(Murdock, Anthony)
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE Statement by J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc. (Murdock, Anthony)
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D Schmidt on behalf of J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Charles D. Schmidt (Schmidt, Charles)
September 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea L Murdock on behalf of J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Andrea L. Murdock (Murdock, Andrea)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony K Murdock on behalf of J William Gailbreath, The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Anthony K. Murdock (Murdock, Anthony)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by George D Guritz.(O'Neill, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE Statement by George D Guritz. (O'Neill, Matthew)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew W O'Neill on behalf of George D Guritz. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew W. O'Neill (O'Neill, Matthew)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Cirincione, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc served on 8/15/2019. (Cirincione, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. George D. Guritz served on 8/12/2019. (Cirincione, James)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. J. William Gailbreath served on 8/15/2019. (Cirincione, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/5/2019. Judge Pamela Pepper recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lynn Adelman for all further proceedings. (cc: all counsel)(kgw)
August 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (vkb)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Plaintiffs. (Cirincione, James)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Defendants by Eric Spyra, Robert W. Thomas Roth IRA, Spurmaxim Inc Profit Sharing Plan, Robert W Thomas. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3177035) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Cirincione, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spyra et al v. The Heartland Christian Advisors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. William Gailbreath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George D. Guritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heartland Christian Advisors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George D Guritz
Represented By: Matthew W O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Heartland Christian Advisors Inc
Represented By: Andrea L Murdock
Represented By: Anthony K Murdock
Represented By: Charles D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J William Gailbreath
Represented By: Andrea L Murdock
Represented By: Anthony K Murdock
Represented By: Charles D Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spurmaxim Inc Profit Sharing Plan
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Brent D Nistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Thomas
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Brent D Nistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Spyra
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Brent D Nistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Thomas Roth IRA
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W Thomas Roth IRA
Represented By: James F Cirincione
Represented By: Brent D Nistler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?