Hoke v. Wisconsin Dane County Child Support Agency et al
Plaintiff: Dennis D Hoke, Jr
Defendant: Julie Genovese, Anne M Wersland, Anton S Jamieson, Wisconsin Dane County Child Support Agency and Gary Ronald Gomez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01157
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: David E Jones
Referring Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved as to form by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/10/2019. Action DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dennis D Hoke, Jr)(jm)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/10/2019: ADOPTING #6 Magistrate Judge William E Duffin's Report and Recommendations; OVERRULING #7 Plaintiff's Objection thereto; and DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Dennis D Hoke, Jr)(jm)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION to Report and Recommendations filed by Dennis D Hoke, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(asc)
September 24, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. >strike> Judge J P Stadtmueller no longer assigned to the case. (mlm) Modified on 9/25/2019 (asc).
September 23, 2019 ...(continued from ECF No. #6 ) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/23/19. IT IS RECOMMENDED that Hoke's complaint and this action be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff)(mlm)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/23/2019, granting plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee. (continued below)... (cc: all counsel, plaintiff) (mlm)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dennis D Hoke, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm)
September 13, 2019 Due to the unavailability of Magistrate Judge David E. Jones, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge William E Duffin to be filed within 21 days. The consent/refusal form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov and has been mailed to the Pro Se Plaintiff. (kah)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Dennis D Hoke, Jr. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (amb)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Dennis D Hoke, Jr. (ds)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Dennis D Hoke, Jr. (ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoke v. Wisconsin Dane County Child Support Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Genovese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne M Wersland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anton S Jamieson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wisconsin Dane County Child Support Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Ronald Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis D Hoke, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?