Skauge v. Saul
Plaintiff: Rick Lee Skauge
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 2:2019cv01165
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Pamela Pepper
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Hearing: Social Security Hearing set for 7/15/2021 at 2:30 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. The parties are to appear by calling the court's conference line at 888-557-8511 and using access code 4893665#. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/11/2020 re #36 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's Brief Instanter. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's unopposed motion to file his brief instanter and ORDERS that the reply brief filed on August 7, 2020, dkt. no. 35, is deemed timely filed. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
August 10, 2020 Filing 36 Unopposed MOTION to File to file Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Angermeier, Vincent)
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 Plaintiffs Reply Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Altaweel v Saul) (Angermeier, Vincent)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 7/7/2020 re #32 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his reply brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on August 5, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Vincent R Angermeier in Support of Motion for Extension to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief (Angermeier, Vincent)
July 6, 2020 Filing 32 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Angermeier, Vincent)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 6/5/2020 re #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's unopposed motion and ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his reply brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on July 6, 2020 (the plaintiff requested a due date of July 4, 2020, which is a federal holiday, so the court is setting the due date for the next business day). Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
June 4, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of Vincent R Angermeier in Support of Motion for Extension to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief (Angermeier, Vincent)
June 4, 2020 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Reply Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Angermeier, Vincent)
May 19, 2020 Filing 28 Commissioners Brief filed by Andrew M Saul. (Cohn, Emily)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 4/20/2020 re #25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 20, 2020; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply, should he choose to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on June 4, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
April 17, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
April 17, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohn, Emily)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 3/20/2020 re #22 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time. The court GRANTS the defendant's motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the defendant to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 20, 2020; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply, if he chooses to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on May 5, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
March 19, 2020 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
March 19, 2020 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohn, Emily)
February 10, 2020 Filing 21 Plaintiffs Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Angermeier, Vincent)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 1/14/2020 re #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 9, 2020; the time for the Commissioner to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 20, 2020; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply, should he choose to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on April 4, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Vincent R Angermeier in Support of Motion for Extension to File Plaintiffs Brief (Angermeier, Vincent)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Angermeier, Vincent)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/31/2019 re #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief. The court GRANTS the plaintiff's unopposed motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on January 10, 2020; the time for the defendant to file his reply is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 19, 2020; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply, should he choose to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on March 5, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Vincent R Angermeier to Support Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief (Angermeier, Vincent)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Angermeier, Vincent)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 12/3/2019 re #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief. The court GRANTS the motion for an extension of time. The court ORDERS that the time for the plaintiff to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on December 27, 2019; the time for the Commissioner to file his brief is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 5, 2020; the time for the plaintiff to file a reply, if he chooses to do so, is EXTENDED until the end of the day on February 20, 2020. Note: there is no document associated with this text only order. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to file Plaintiff's Brief by Rick Lee Skauge. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Angermeier, Vincent)
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Transcript, #2 Transcript, #3 Transcript, #4 Transcript, #5 Transcript, #6 Transcript, #7 Transcript, #8 Transcript, #9 Transcript, #10 Transcript, #11 Transcript, #12 Transcript, #13 Transcript) (Pawlak, Brian)
October 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Andrew M Saul (Pawlak, Brian)
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; US Attorney General served on 8/27/2019. (blr)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail; Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/26/2019. (blr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Rick Lee Skauge. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Angermeier, Vincent)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Skutch Cohn on behalf of Andrew M Saul. Attorney(s) appearing: Emily S. Cohn (Cohn, Emily)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Andrew M Saul. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties. By 10/18/2019 defendant to file and serve certified administrative record. Plaintiff's brief due 11/27/2019; defendant's response due 1/6/2020; plaintiff's reply due 1/21/2020. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 16, 2019 Transmit Complaint and Order via certified mail to the Commissioner of Social Security and the US Attorney General; US Attorney served electronically via CM/ECF (asc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Judge Pamela Pepper on 8/15/2019 GRANTING #3 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel) (cb)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Pamela Pepper ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website (jcl)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Rick Lee Skauge. (Angermeier, Vincent)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE Statement by Rick Lee Skauge. (Angermeier, Vincent)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Rick Lee Skauge (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit ALJ Denial, #3 Exhibit AC Denial, #4 Exhibit 30 day extension to file)(Angermeier, Vincent)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skauge v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Lee Skauge
Represented By: Vincent R Angermeier
Represented By: Robert C Angermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Brian E Pawlak
Represented By: Emily Skutch Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?