Oleksak v. Gateway Technical College
Plaintiff: Glenn Oleksak
Defendant: Gateway Technical College
Case Number: 2:2019cv01167
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: William E Duffin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Salsieder v. Board of Regents of University of Wisconsin System7)(Roth, Tyler)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by Gateway Technical College re #14 MOTION to Dismiss . (Roth, Tyler)
September 30, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Glenn Oleksak re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Originally filed in Kenosha County Circuit Court on 7/16/2019.) (mlm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support filed by Gateway Technical College re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Originally filed in Kenosha County Circuit Court on 6/27/2019.) (mlm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Gateway Technical College. (Originally filed in Kenosha County Circuit Court on 6/27/2019.) (mlm)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 9/27/2019 DENYING #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to State Court. (cc: all counsel) (lz)
September 23, 2019 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (mlm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 12 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Rose, Terry)
September 6, 2019 SECOND NOTICE from the clerk to Plaintiff requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed within 14 days; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (mlm)
September 5, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Tyler J. Roth (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 6/7/19 Conference Order and Notice of Scheduling, #2 Exhibit 2 - 7/9/19 Notice of Hearing, #3 Exhibit 3 - Reder v. Pearlman, #4 Exhibit 4 - Kadambi v. Express Scripts, #5 Exhibit 5 - Jackson Cnty Bank v. Dusablon, #6 Exhibit 6 - Dorazio v. UAL Corp.)(Roth, Tyler)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Gateway Technical College re #8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Kenosha County Circuit Court . (Roth, Tyler)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Gateway Technical College. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Roth, Tyler)
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Remand to State Court Kenosha County Circuit Court by Glenn Oleksak. (Rose, Terry)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Terry W Rose on behalf of Glenn Oleksak. Attorney(s) appearing: Terry W. Rose (Rose, Terry)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website. (ds)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsey W Davis on behalf of Gateway Technical College. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Scullen, Lindsey W. Davis, Tyler J. Roth (Davis, Lindsey)
August 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean M Scullen on behalf of Gateway Technical College. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Scullen, Lindsey W. Davis, Tyler J. Roth (Scullen, Sean)
August 14, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gateway Technical College (Roth, Tyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE Statement by Gateway Technical College. (Roth, Tyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Roth on behalf of Gateway Technical College. Attorney(s) appearing: Sean M. Scullen, Lindsey W. Davis, Tyler J. Roth (Roth, Tyler)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gateway Technical College from Kenosha County Circuit Court, Case Number: 19-cv-0674 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3188299) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant_s Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Roth, Tyler) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/15/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oleksak v. Gateway Technical College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gateway Technical College
Represented By: Lindsey W Davis
Represented By: Tyler J Roth
Represented By: Sean M Scullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Oleksak
Represented By: Terry W Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?