Grafton School District v. L
Plaintiff: Grafton School District
Defendant: J L
Case Number: 2:2019cv01179
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED Stipulated Protective Order filed by Grafton School District. (Thome, Matthew)
October 8, 2019 Filing 18 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Grafton School District. (Thome, Matthew)
October 3, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to Counterclaim re #11 filed by Grafton School District. (Thome, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support filed by Grafton School District re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unreported Cases Cited in Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Preliminary Enjoin the ALJ Decision & Order Pending Resolution of this Case on the Merits)(Thome, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Christine V. Hamiel in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2 - Restricted, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 3 - Restricted, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 4 - Restricted, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 5 - Restricted, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 6 - Restricted, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 7 - Restricted, #14 Exhibit 8, #15 Exhibit 8 - Restricted, #16 Exhibit 9, #17 Exhibit 9 - Restricted, #18 Exhibit 10, #19 Exhibit 10 - Restricted, #20 Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit 11 - Restricted, #22 Exhibit 12, #23 Exhibit 12 - Restricted, #24 Exhibit 13, #25 Exhibit 13 - Restricted, #26 Exhibit 14, #27 Exhibit 14 - Restricted, #28 Exhibit 15, #29 Exhibit 15 - Restricted, #30 Exhibit 16, #31 Exhibit 16 - Restricted)This document and/or certain attachments are restricted to case participants and attorneys of record should use their efiling login and password to view this document(Hamiel, Christine)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Grafton School District. (Thome, Matthew)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 Expedited MOTION to Restrict Document Pursuant to L.R. 7(h) and General L.R. 79(d) by Grafton School District. (Thome, Matthew)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/13/19. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on 10/25/19 at 11:30 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM against Grafton School District filed by All Defendants . (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D Spitzer-Resnick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey Spitzer-Resnick (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Defendants. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE Statement by All Defendants. (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 DISREGARD; SEE #10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey D Spitzer-Resnick on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey Spitzer-Resnick (Spitzer-Resnick, Jeffrey) Modified on 9/11/2019 (kah).
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Grafton School District. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Thome, Matthew)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE Statement by Grafton School District. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Thome, Matthew)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Accepting Service and Providing Schedule For Responding to the Complaint by Grafton School District. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Andrew)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine V Hamiel on behalf of Grafton School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Christine V. Hamiel (Hamiel, Christine)
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Thome on behalf of Grafton School District. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew J. Thome (Thome, Matthew)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (ds)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J L by Grafton School District. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number BWIEDC-3189449) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Phillips, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (ds). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/15/2019) (ds).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grafton School District v. L
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L
Represented By: Jeffrey D Spitzer-Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grafton School District
Represented By: Andrew T Phillips
Represented By: Christine V Hamiel
Represented By: Matthew J Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?