Love v. Armor Health Care et al
Plaintiff: James A Love
Defendant: Armor Health Care, G4S Transportation Services, MMHI Hospitals and Milwaukee County Correctional Facility
Case Number: 2:2019cv01184
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: Lynn Adelman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 9/23/19 that the plaintiff is assessed $1.20 as an initial partial payment of the $350.00 fee for filing this case. (cc: all counsel, plaintiff, warden, financial)(jad)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A Love. (mac)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff, requesting requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed. (bx)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A Love. (mac) Modified on 8/23/2019 (blr).
August 22, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by James A Love. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mac)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the Clerk to James A Love regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet)(tlf)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER from the clerk to James A Love re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. Also requesting that a six-month certified prisoner trust account statement be filed within 21 days. (mac)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by James A Love. (mac)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by James A Love. (mac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Armor Health Care et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Health Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Transportation Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMHI Hospitals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milwaukee County Correctional Facility
Represented By: Milwaukee County - 550, 555
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?