Castellano v. Keller et al
Plaintiff: John Joseph Castellano
Defendant: Sarah J Watson, Dean E Stolldorf, Christina E Holcomb and Amy A Keller
Case Number: 2:2019cv01185
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address as to John Joseph Castellano. New address is 3916 N Port Washington Road, Milwaukee, WI 53212. (asc)
September 9, 2019 Filing 8 PARTIAL Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Joseph Castellano. (asc)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE re Current Release Date by John Joseph Castellano (asc)
September 3, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $2.40, receipt number MK4689-079323; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department. (ds)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 8/23/2019 ORDERING that on or before 9/13/2019, Plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $2.40 as an initial partial filing fee in this action. (cc: all counsel, via mail to John Joseph Castellano and Warden at Milwaukee Secure Detention Facility)(jm)
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by John Joseph Castellano. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (asc)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from the clerk to Plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph and requesting that the consent/refusal form be filed within 21 days. (ds)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John Joseph Castellano. (ds)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by John Joseph Castellano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ds)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by John Joseph Castellano. (Attachments: #1 Addendum to Complaint)(ds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellano v. Keller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean E Stolldorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina E Holcomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy A Keller
Represented By: Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Joseph Castellano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?