Bach v. Ludwig et al
Appellant: Margaret Ann Bach
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee and Helen M Ludwig
Case Number: 2:2019cv01208
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Wisconsin
Presiding Judge: J P Stadtmueller
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 10/8/2019 DENYING: #6 Motion for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee and #7 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Margaret Ann Bach) (jm)
October 8, 2019 Appeal Short Record Returned re #4 Notice of Appeal restricted filer. (jv)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #4 Notice of Appeal (jv)
October 4, 2019 Filing 8 Pro Se Cover Letter re: #4 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(jv)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Margaret Ann Bach. (jv)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appeal Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Margaret Ann Bach. (jv)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Docketing Statement by Margaret Ann Bach re #4 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (jv)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case by Margaret Ann Bach. (cc: all counsel) (jv)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Judge J P Stadtmueller on 9/18/2019. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Margaret Ann Bach)(jm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 RECORD ON APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 12-20450. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet with Order Denying Motion to Reopen Case) Bankruptcy Appeal Fee still not paid.(kan)
August 23, 2019 Docket Annotation - Filing fee has not been paid to the bankruptcy court (vkb)
August 20, 2019 NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller (jcl)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL (Short Record) from Bankruptcy Court case number 12-20450; (Attachments: #1 Motion to Stay Pending Appeal, #2 Bankruptcy Court Docket Sheet, Documents 23-24)(ljr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Wisconsin Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bach v. Ludwig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Margaret Ann Bach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Helen M Ludwig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?